HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
3
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Offices and positions held during 2019
Outside Hermès Group companies
French companies SCI de l’Univers s
Foreign companies
None
Executive Chairman
SCI Tibemo s
Executive Co-Chairman
SCI Zotila Vaugirard s Chairman SIFAH s Chairman
Société civile du Château Fourcas Hosten s Permanent Representative of Lor, Executive Chairman
Other offices and positions held during the previous four financial years and ending before 1 January 2019
French companies
Foreign companies
None
28-30-32 Faubourg-Saint-Honoré s
Chairman (term ended on 02/07/2015) H2 s
Chairman (term ended on 18/05/2016) SCI du 74 rue du Faubourg-Saint-Antoine s Executive Co-Chairman (term ended on 18/01/2019) SCI Briand Villiers I s Executive Chairman (term ended on 05/06/2019) SCI Briand Villiers II s Executive Chairman (term ended on 04/12/2019) Société immobilière du Faubourg-Saint-Honoré s “SIFAH” Executive Chairman (term ended on 02/07/2015) ▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
234
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs