HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Age 42 years 1 (8 January 1978) Nationality Franco-American Address c/o Hermès International 24, rue du Faubourg-Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris Shares held on 31 December 2019 100 in full ownership and registered — Date of first appointment Supervisory Board 4 June 2019 Audit and Risk Committee 4 June 2019 Term of current office 2021 GM
ALEXANDRE VIROS Independent member of the Hermès International Supervisory Board Member of the Audit and Risk Committee
Summary of main areas of expertise and experience Mr Alexandre Viros is Agrégé de Philosophie , holds a post-graduate degree in cognitive sciences from École des Hautes Études en Sciences Sociales (EHESS), and is a graduate of Sciences Po Paris. He began his career in 2001 in higher education and research. In 2004, he joined the Boston Consulting Group (BCG), where he worked for four years, mainly in services (transport, banking, insurance, media). In 2008, he joined the Fnac group’s strategy department, before being appointed Director of Music and Audio. He then took the helm of the commercial department before serving as Chairman of France Billet. In 2016, he was appointed Marketing and e-Commerce Director of Fnac Darty, and joined the Executive Committee. Since February 2018, Mr Viros has been CEO of OUI.sncf (formerly voyages-sncf.com), and a member of the SNCF Mobilités Executive Committee. His expertise in the e-commerce and retailing universe, his knowledge of customer relations and his ability to work in industries undergoing profound transformation and seeing the emergence disruptive models, as well as the commitment with which he carries out his duties and participates in the Audit and Risk Committee enable him to make an effective contribution to the quality of the discussions and work of the Board in all of its areas of responsibility. Through his background and his Franco-American culture, he also brings his open-mindedness, his innovative approach to issues and a keen eye on the digital world.
3
Main activities outside the Company
Managing Director of Oui.sncf
In Hermès Group companies
French companies ▲
Foreign companies ▲
None
Hermès International ● s
Member of the Supervisory Board and the Audit Committee
Offices and positions held during financial year 2019
Outside Hermès Group companies
French companies
Foreign companies
Loco 2 Holding (United Kingdom) s
OUI.sncf s
CEO, member of the Executive Committee
Director
E-Voyageurs groupe (SAS) s Director and Managing Director Agence-Oui.sncf (SAS) s Chairman Rail Europe SAS s Member of the Supervisory Board
Other offices and positions held during the previous four financial years and ending before 1 January 2019
French companies Fnac-Darty ● s
Foreign companies
None
Marketing and E-Commerce Director, member of the Executive Committee (term ended on 31/01/2018) The age indicated is determined as of the date of filing of this Universal registration document, i.e. 25 March 2020. (1) ▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
235
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs