HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Other offices and positions held during the previous four financial years and ending before 1 January 2019
French companies
Foreign companies
Herlee ▲ (Australia) s
Castille Investissement ▲ s
Permanent Representative of Hermès
Chairman and Director
International, Chairman
(term ended on 30/06/2017) Hermès Australia ▲ (Australia) s
(term ended on 28/06/2016)
Chairman of the Board of Directors and Director
Créations Métaphores ▲ s
Permanent Representative of Hermès International, member of the Management Board (term ended on 23/06/2015)
(term ended on 05/02/2015) Hermès GB ▲ (United Kingdom) s
Chairman and Director
(term ended on 15/04/2015)
Grafton Immobilier ▲ s
Chairman (term ended on 29/06/2015)
Hermès Italie ▲ (Italy) s
Chairman of the Board of Directors and Director
Tannerie de Vivoin ▲ s
Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Chairman (term ended on 30/06/2015)
term ended on 20/03/2015)
3
Hermès Horizons ▲ s Chairman (term ended on 31/05/2016) Immobilière du 5, rue de Furstemberg s Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Chairman (term ended on 29/06/2015) Isamyol 28 ▲ s Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Chairman (term ended on 29/06/2016) Isamyol 30 ▲ s Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Chairman (term ended on 29/06/2016) Isamyol 31 ▲ s Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Chairman (term ended on 29/06/2016) Isamyol 32 ▲ s Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Chairman (term ended on 29/06/2016) Isamyol 33 ▲ s Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Chairman (term ended on 29/06/2016) SCI Auger-Hoche ▲ s Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Executive Chairman (term ended on 21/12/2015) ▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
201
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs