HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
3
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Outside Hermès Group companies
Offices and positions held during 2019
French companies
Foreign companies
None
Axam 2 s
Executive Chairman
H51 s
Director L’Oréal ● ✱ s Director and member of the Audit and Risk Committee (since 18/04/2019) Maia s Executive Chairman Mathel s Executive Chairman
Other offices and positions held during the previous four financial years and ending before 1 January 2019
French companies Ateliers A.S. ✱ s
Foreign companies
Boissy Mexico ▲ (Mexico) s
Permanent Representative of Hermès
Acting Director (term ended on 14/11/2018) Hermès Benelux Nordics ▲ (Belgium) s Director (term ended on 15/04/2015)
International, Director
(term ended on 18/10/2018)
Hermès Canada ▲ (Canada) s
CHP3 ▲ s
Chairman (term ended on 12/10/2018) Compagnie Hermès de Participations ▲ s Permanent Representative of Hermès
Chairman and Director
(term ended on 12/10/2018)
Hermès de Paris (Mexico) ▲ (Mexico) s
International, Chairman
Acting Director (term ended on 14/11/2018)
(term ended on 12/10/2018)
Hermès do Brasil ▲ (Brazil) s
Member of the Advisory Board (term ended on 25/09/2017)
Hermès Sellier ▲ s
Chairman Executive Corporate Officer
of the following division:
Hermès Grèce ▲ (Greece) s
Director (term ended on 30/11/2018)
Hermès Distribution France ▲ s (term ended on 30/06/2018) Maroquinerie de Normandie ▲ s Permanent Representative of Hermès
Hermès Ibérica ▲ (Spain) s
Director (term ended on 14/11/2018) Hermès Immobilier Genève ▲ (Switzerland) s Director (term ended on 10/05/2016) Hermès India Retail and Distributors ▲ (India) s
International, Chairman
(term ended on 07/09/2015)
Director (term ended on 07/09/2018)
Motsch-George V ▲ s
Permanent Representative of Hermès
Hermès Latin America ▲ s (United States of America)
International, Chairman
(term ended on 29/06/2015)
Director (term ended on 21/05/2015)
Hermès Monte-Carlo ▲ (Principality of Monaco) s Permanent Representative of Hermès Sellier, Director (term ended on 28/04/2015) Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Vice-Chairman, Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Director (term ended on 12/10/2018) Hermès Retail (Malaysia) ▲ (Malaysia) s
SCI Boissy Les Mûriers ▲ s
Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Executive Chairman
(term ended on 31/12/2015)
SCI Boissy Nontron ▲ s
Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Executive Chairman
(term ended on 31/12/2015)
Chairman and Director
SCI Édouard VII ▲ s
Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Executive Chairman
(term ended on 12/10/2018)
Herlee ▲ (Hong Kong) s Chairman and Director
(term ended on 31/12/2015)
(term ended on 30/06/2017)
SCI Honossy ▲ s
Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Executive Chairman (term ended on 31/12/2015) SCI Les Capucines ▲ s Permanent Representative of Hermès International, Chairman (term ended on 29/06/2015) ▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
200
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs