HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
3
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Address c/o Hermès International 24, rue du Faubourg-Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris Shares held on 31 December 2019 33 236 in full ownership and registered —
ÉMILE HERMÈS SARL Co-Executive Chairman Represented by its Executive Chairman, Mr Henri-Louis Bauer
Summary of main areas of expertise and experience Émile Hermès SARL is a société à responsabilité limitée à capital variable (private limited company with variable capital) whose partners are the direct descendants of Émile-Maurice Hermès and his wife. Émile Hermès SARL has an Executive Management Board chaired by Mr Henri-Louis Bauer (appointed Executive Chairman on 1 July 2012), himself a direct descendant of Mr Émile-Maurice Hermès. Émile Hermès SARL’s main purpose is to be the Active Partner of Hermès International. Its functioning is described on page 387 and seq. Émile Hermès SARL has been the Active Partner of Hermès International since 27 December 1990. Émile Hermès SARL was appointed as Executive Chairman on that date and held that office until 31 December 1994. Since 1 April 2006, it has again been Executive Chairman of Hermès International for an open-ended term. It does not now hold nor has it in the past held any offices in any other company
Date of first appointment From 27 December 1990 to 31 December 1994 and again since 1 April 2006 Term of current office Open-ended
Main activities outside the Company
None Émile Hermès SARL
Henri-Louis Bauer Direct descendant of Mr Émile-Maurice Hermès
In Hermès Group companies
French companies ▲
French companies ▲
None
Hermès International ● s
Active Partner and Executive Co-Chairman
Foreign companies ▲
Foreign companies ▲
Offices and positions held during 2019
None
None
Outside Hermès Group companies
French companies
French companies
Néant
Émile Hermès SARL s Executive Chairman and Chairman of the Executive Management Board Aucleris 2 s Executive Chairman H2 s Director H51 s Administrateur Sabarots s Director Samain B2 s Executive Chairman SIFAH s Director
Foreign companies
Foreign companies
None
None
Other offices and positions held during the previous four financial years and ending before 1 January 2019
French companies
French companies
None
Aucleris s Manager (term ended on 27/12/2015)
Foreign companies
Foreign companies
None
None
▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
202
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs