HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
3
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Offices and positions held during financial year 2019
Outside Hermès Group companies
French companies
Société Immobilière du Dragon s Executive Chairwoman Val d’Isère Carojero s Executive Chairwoman
Other offices and positions held during the previous four financial years and ending before 1 January 2019
French companies
Foreign companies
None
Compagnie des Cuirs Précieux ▲ s
Deputy Managing Director – Finance and Organisation (term ended on 15/04/2017) Hermès Cuirs Précieux ▲ s Member of the Management Board (term ended on 15/04/2017) 28-30-32 Faubourg-Saint-Honoré s Director (term ended on 15/07/2015) SCI Briand Villiers I s Executive Chairwoman (term ended on 19/04/2018) Vie et Véranda groupe s Director (term ended on 28/01/2019)
▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
230
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs