HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Age 45 years 1 (26 February 1975) Nationality French Address c/o Hermès International 24, rue du Faubourg-Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris Shares held on 31 December 2019 5,825 wholly-owned and registered — Date of first appointment Supervisory Board 2 June 2005
JULIE GUERRAND Member of the Hermès International Supervisory Board Direct descendant of Mr Émile-Maurice Hermès
Summary of main areas of expertise and experience Ms Julie Guerrand holds a DEUG advanced degree in applied mathematics and social sciences and a Masters in Economics and Industrial Strategy from the Université Paris IX-Dauphine. From 1998 to 2006, she worked in the financial affairs department (M&A advisory) of investment bank Rothschild & Cie. From 2007 to 2011, she was Director of Equity Investments in the investment team at Paris Orléans, a holding company listed on Euronext and controlled by the Rothschild family. She held positions in the Hermès Group from 2011 to 2017 as Corporate Development Director of Hermès International before becoming Deputy Managing Director – Finance and Organisation of the Hermès Cuirs Précieux division. Ms Julie Guerrand has been certified as a Company director (ASC France) by the IFA and Sciences Po since 2014. She brings to the Board her in-depth knowledge of the history and culture of Hermès. Her experience in the fields of finance and M&A, as well as her legal expertise and the commitment with which she carries out her duties enable her to contribute actively to the quality of the discussions and work of the Board in all of its areas of responsibility.
3
Julie Guerrand was also a member of the Audit Committee (now the Audit and Risk Committee) from its inception on 26 January 2005 until 2 March 2011. Term of current office 2022 GM
Main activities outside the Company
Company director.
In Hermès Group companies
French companies ▲
Foreign companies ▲
None
Hermès International ● s
Offices and positions held during financial year 2019
Member of the Supervisory Board
Outside Hermès Group companies
French companies
Foreign companies
Jakyval ( Luxembourg ) s
Antonino s
Executive Chairwoman
Director
H51 s
Chairwoman
Idi s Member of the Supervisory Board Jerocaro s Executive Chairwoman La mazarine-SCIFAH s Executive Chairwoman Les domaines Barons de Rothschild (Lafite) s Member of the Supervisory Board SCI Apremont s Executive Chairwoman SCI Briand Villiers II s Executive Chairwoman SCI 8 Drouot s Executive Chairwoman SIFAH s Director
The age indicated is determined as of the date of filing of this Universal registration document, i.e. 25 March 2020. (1) ▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
229
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs