HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
3
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Other offices and positions held during the previous four financial years and ending before 1 January 2019
French companies Altamir Gérance s
Foreign companies
None
Deputy Chief Executive Officer (term ended on 04/05/2015) Global Project SAS s Member of the Supervisory Board (term ended on 15/09/2017) JC Decaux ● s Member of the Supervisory Board (term ended on 11/05/2017) Trocadéro Participations s Member of the Supervisory Board (until 26/07/2016) Trocadéro Participations II s Chairwoman (term ended on 26/07/2016) ▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
218
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs