HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
3
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
SUMMARY OF CHANGES IN THE COMPOSITION OF THE SUPERVISORY BOARD OVER THE FINANCIAL YEAR
Departures
Appointments
Renewals
Supervisory Board
Ms Sharon MacBeath (20/03/2019) Mr Robert Peugeot (04/06/2019) Mr Frédéric Afriat, employee representative (12/11/2019)
Ms Estelle Brachlianoff (04/06/2019) Mr Alexandre Viros (04/06/2019) Ms Pureza Cardoso, employee representative (12/11/2019) Mr Rémy Kroll, employee representative (12/11/2019)
Ms Julie Guerrand (04/06/2019) Ms Dominique Senequier (04/06/2019) Mr Charles-Éric Bauer (04/06/2019)
Changes in terms of diversification (representation of women, nationality or experience) or change with respect to corporate governance
The appointment of two new members to the Board served to: restore the proportion of independent members on the Board (1/3), the Audit and Risk Committee (60%) s and the CAG-CSR Committee (2/3); maintain the proportion of women (50%); s maintain certain skills and bring new ones to the Board. s The appointment by the Group Works Council of two employee representatives (one woman and one man) to the Supervisory Board allowed the Group to apply the provisions of the Pacte law without waiting for the amendment of the Articles of Association.
Changes in the Supervisory Board since 31 December 2019 None
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
214
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs