HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Age 59 years 1 (1 March 1961) Nationality French Address c/o Hermès International 24, rue du Faubourg-Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris Shares held on 31 December 2019 200 in full ownership and registered — Date of first appointment Supervisory Board 6 June 2017 Term of current office 2020 GM
DOROTHÉE ALTMAYER Member of the Hermès International Supervisory Board Direct descendant of Mr Émile-Maurice Hermès
Summary of main areas of expertise and experience Ms Dorothée Altmayer holds a degree in clinical psychology from École de psychologues praticiens (EPP/Psychoprat) (1984), a diploma in graphology from the Société française de graphologie (1987) and a diploma in plastic arts mediation psychotherapy (2006). She first worked as a recruitment and outplacement consultant at International Business Drive (Algoe Executive group). Since 2000 she has been a practising clinical psychologist. She has held temporary positions at the Hôpital Necker, the Main dans la main association, the Institut Mutualiste Montsouris (day hospital for adolescents) and the Centre Recherches et Rencontres. Since 2007 she has run her own private practice, specialising in parent-child interviews, psychological evaluations and individual art therapy sessions for children. She brings to the Board her in-depth knowledge of the history and culture of Hermès. Her professional background, her skills in human resources, and the commitment with which she carries out her duties enable her to make an effective contribution to the quality of the discussions and work of the Board in all of its areas of responsibility.
3
Main activities outside the Company
Clinical psychology specialising in parent-child interviews, psychological assessments and individual art therapy sessions for children
In Hermès Group companies
French companies ▲
Foreign companies ▲
None
Hermès International ● s
Member of the Supervisory Board Comptoir Nouveau de la Parfumerie ✱ s Director
Offices and positions held during financial year 2019
Outside Hermès Group companies
French companies
Foreign companies
None
Alvila s
Executive Chairwoman
Alvila Immobilier s
Executive Chairwoman
H2 s
Director
Other offices and positions held during the previous four financial years and ending before 1 January 2019
French companies Hermès Sellier ▲ s
Foreign companies
None
Member of the Management Board (term ended on 12/09/2017) The age indicated is determined as of the date of filing of this Universal registration document, i.e. 25 March 2020. (1) ▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
221
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs