HERMÈS - 2019 Universal Registration Document
3
CORPORATE GOVERNANCE SUPERVISORY BOARD'S' REPORT ON CORPORATE GOVERNANCE
Other offices and positions held during the previous four financial years and ending before 1 January 2019
French companies
Foreign companies
Yamaha Motor Turkey ( Turkey ) s
Brame et Lorenceau s
Director (term ended on 31/12/2015)
Director (term ended on 31/12/2015)
C.S.I.A.M s Co-Chairman (term ended on 16/11/2017) Les Producteurs SA s Director (until January 2019) Naturéo Finance SAS s Member of the Management Board (term ended on 31/12/2015) Yamaha Motor France s Director, and Chairman and Chief Executive Officer (term ended on 01/02/2015) ▲ Hermès Group entity ● Listed company ✱ Office taken into account when calculating multiple offices
2019 UNIVERSAL REGISTRATION DOCUMENT HERMÈS INTERNATIONAL
216
Made with FlippingBook - Online catalogs