Aéroport de Paris - 2018 Registration document
ADMINISTRATION AND EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT BODIES
RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, TRADEMARKS PATENTS AND LICENCES
INFORMATION CONCERNING TRENDS
PROFIT FORECASTS
COMPENSATION AND BENEFITS OF CORPORATE OFFICERS
FUNCTIONING OF THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS AND MANAGEMENT BODIES
SOCIAL, ENVIRONMENTAL AND SOCIETAL RESPONSIBILITY INFORMATION
MAIN SHAREHOLDERS
OPERATIONS WITH RELATED PARTIES
FINANCIAL INFORMATION ON THE ASSETS, FINANCIAL POSITION AND CONSOLIDATED FINANCIAL STATEMENTS AT 31 DECEMBER 2018
Summary presentation of the Board of Directors
Personal information
Position on the Board of Directors
Independence as defined in the AFEP-MEDEF Code
Committee members
The Compensa- tion, Appoint- ments and Governance Committee
Strategy and Investment Commit- tee
Number of shares as of 31/12/2018
Number of mandates in listed companies
Audit and Risk Committee
Seniority on the Board
Expiry of the mandate
Initial date of appointment
Non- independent Independent
Age Gender Nationality
CHAIRMAN AND CEO ® The current mandate came into effect on 15 July 2014, for a term of five years Augustin de Romanet 57 Male French 300 2 Chairman and CEO DIRECTORS APPOINTED BY THE GENERAL MEETING OF SHAREHOLDERS ® The mandate came into effect on 15 July 2014, for a period of five years
14
Chairman X
29/11/2012 20/05/2019 6 years
Jacques Gounon
Independent
Chairman X
65 Male French
300
2
director 02/07/2008 20/05/2019 10 years
X
Executive officer of Royal Schiphol Group, whose Board of Directors includes an ADP director officer of Royal Schiphol Group, whose Board of Directors includes an ADP director Former executive
Jacoba van der Meijs
52 Female Dutch
1
1
23/05/2017 20/05/2019 1 year
Jos Nijhuis Vinci represented by Xavier Huillard Predica represented by Françoise Debrus
61
Male Dutch
1
1
28/05/2009 20/05/2019 9 years
X
Significant business relationship
64 Male French 7,916,848
2
15/07/2014 20/05/2019 4 years
X
Independent
Chairwoman X
58 Female French 5,051,791
3
director 15/07/2014 20/05/2019 4 years
X
DIRECTOR REPRESENTING THE FRENCH STATE, APPOINTED BY DECREE ON 11 MAY 2017 ® The mandate came into effect on 11 May 2017, for a period of five years
2022 General Meeting 6 years
Solenne Lepage
Majority shareholder
46 Female French X DIRECTORS APPOINTED BY THE GENERAL MEETING OF SHAREHOLDERS OF 11 MAY 2017, ON PROPOSAL BY THE FRENCH STATE ® The mandate came into effect on 11 May 2017, for a period of five years 0 1 2 24/09/2012 X X
125
AÉROPORTS DE PARIS ® REGISTRATION DOCUMENT 2018
Made with FlippingBook HTML5